NY S04074 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.466
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.466
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Ulster county as the "Ulster County Korean War Veterans' Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Ulster county as the "Ulster County Korean War Veterans' Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.466 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.294 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a1665 |
2021-03-31 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.635 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01665 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - substituted by s4074