NY S04051 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-13 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-13 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to recoupment of overpayments of child support in family and supreme court.
Title
Relates to recoupment of overpayments of child support in family and supreme court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2012-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1203 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4051A |
2012-05-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-05-02 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2011-05-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.272 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |