NY S04049 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the judgment of sale in a mortgage foreclosure action shall direct that in the event such premises is purchased collectively by more than one individual, the names of each individual purchaser shall be disclosed in writing to the sheriff of the county or referee conducting the sale.
Title
Provides that the judgment of sale in a mortgage foreclosure action shall direct that in the event such premises is purchased collectively by more than one individual, the names of each individual purchaser shall be disclosed in writing to the sheriff of the county or referee conducting the sale.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.416 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04291 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to judiciary