NY S04024 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from June 30, 2015 to June 30, 2020, the expiration of provisions of the town law relating to payments in lieu of taxes for property acquired for park or recreational purposes by the town of Hempstead.
Title
Extends from June 30, 2015 to June 30, 2020, the expiration of provisions of the town law relating to payments in lieu of taxes for property acquired for park or recreational purposes by the town of Hempstead.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Skelos [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.38 |
2015-06-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.238 |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a5813 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-10 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1402 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05813 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - substituted by s4024