NY S04020 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization of the county of Schoharie to impose a county recording tax on obligation secured by a mortgage on real property until 2015.
Title
Extends the authorization of the county of Schoharie to impose a county recording tax on obligation secured by a mortgage on real property until 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6314 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.852 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06314 (Same As) 2013-07-12 - signed chap.112