NY S03973 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - PRINT NUMBER 3973A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - PRINT NUMBER 3973A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of health to apply for a medicaid reform demonstration waiver; creates an initiative to provide for a more efficient and effective medicaid services delivery system; sets forth a managed care pilot program and requires reporting to the governor, temporary president of the senate and speaker of the assembly by December 31, 2019.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of health to apply for a medicaid reform demonstration waiver; creates an initiative to provide for a more efficient and effective medicaid services delivery system; sets forth a managed care pilot program and requires reporting to the governor, temporary president of the senate and speaker of the assembly by December 31, 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3973A |
2016-01-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05986 (Same As) 2016-01-25 - print number 5986a