NY S03962 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-05 - PRINT NUMBER 3962A
Pending: Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-05 - PRINT NUMBER 3962A
Pending: Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the legislative task force on responsible gaming to develop policies and procedures that foster responsible gaming practices by gaming facilities in New York state.
Title
Establishes the legislative task force on responsible gaming to develop policies and procedures that foster responsible gaming practices by gaming facilities in New York state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3962A |
2014-03-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2013-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A02271 (Same As) 2014-03-04 - reported referred to ways and means