NY S03948 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the court to provide notice to the former owners of foreclosed property of the right to file a claim for the excess funds from the sale of the real property.
Title
Directs the court to provide notice to the former owners of foreclosed property of the right to file a claim for the excess funds from the sale of the real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2018-01-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.91 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2017-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.210 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10168 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - referred to judiciary