NY S03947 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5290
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5290
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that uniformed court officers and peace officers employed in the unified court system shall be entitled to accidental disability retirement if they sustain injuries as the result of a physical assault by an assailant suffered while in service.
Title
Provides that uniformed court officers and peace officers employed in the unified court system shall be entitled to accidental disability retirement if they sustain injuries as the result of a physical assault by an assailant suffered while in service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5290 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | AMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 3947 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3947A |
2015-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.247 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05290 (Same As) 2015-10-26 - tabled