NY S03945 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to veterans' eligibility for public housing; expands eligibility requirements to include veterans of the recent conflicts; requires granting of a preference for public housing to veterans or families of veterans who have a military service connected disability.
Title
Relates to veterans' eligibility for public housing; expands eligibility requirements to include veterans of the recent conflicts; requires granting of a preference for public housing to veterans or families of veterans who have a military service connected disability.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Mario Mattera [R] |
Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2022-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1132 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-05-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.883 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A08301 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to housing