NY S03943 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to health care professional applications and terminations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to health care professional applications and terminations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-06-04Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-31Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1489
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2017-06-21SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-04-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-04-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.648
2017-01-30SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A02704 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.215

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback