NY S03895 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities, the commissioner of education, the commissioner of health, the commissioner of the office of children and family services and the commissioner of mental health to study and report the costs to the state for the early diagnosis of autism spectrum disorder and the long-term treatment for individuals with autism spectrum disorder.
Title
Directs the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities, the commissioner of education, the commissioner of health, the commissioner of the office of children and family services and the commissioner of mental health to study and report the costs to the state for the early diagnosis of autism spectrum disorder and the long-term treatment for individuals with autism spectrum disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A261 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1639 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-03-19 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2017-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00261 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.210