NY S03889 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the removal of an action from a problem solving court; provides that a "problem solving court" shall include, but not be limited to, drug court, domestic violence court, youth court, mental health court and veterans court.
Title
Relates to the removal of an action from a problem solving court; provides that a "problem solving court" shall include, but not be limited to, drug court, domestic violence court, youth court, mental health court and veterans court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.634 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.253 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | substituted for a5937 |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.349 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05937 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.634