NY S03886 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8175
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8175
Summary
Relates to reversing the crediting of a personal income tax or corporate franchise tax overpayment against estimated tax for the succeeding taxable year in certain circumstances.
Title
Relates to reversing the crediting of a personal income tax or corporate franchise tax overpayment against estimated tax for the succeeding taxable year in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Craig Johnson [D] | Sen. George Onorato [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8175 | |
2009-06-01 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-27 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-26 | 1ST REPORT CAL.433 | |
2009-04-02 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A8175 (Same As) 2010-03-09 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03886&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |