NY S03875 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes term limits for the offices of governor, attorney-general and comptroller; limits the amount of time any person can act as governor; limits terms of office of members of the legislature.
Title
Establishes term limits for the offices of governor, attorney-general and comptroller; limits the amount of time any person can act as governor; limits terms of office of members of the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-28 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-03-04 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-02-09 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02612 (Same As) 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary