NY S03867 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.557
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.557
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits deferral of vacation days for certain members of the retirement system.
Title
Permits deferral of vacation days for certain members of the retirement system.
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Adriano Espaillat [D] | Sen. Terry Gipson [D] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] |
Sen. George Maziarz [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.557 |
2014-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.530 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a6780a |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-04-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.388 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3867A |
2014-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1332 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |