NY S03841 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the division of criminal justice services to check the wanted felon status and probation or parole violator status of people applying for public assistance.
Title
Requires the division of criminal justice services to check the wanted felon status and probation or parole violator status of people applying for public assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.893 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03481 (Same As) 2018-03-06 - held for consideration in governmental operations