NY S03829 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.214
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.214
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no person, corporation, partnership or limited liability company shall knowingly sell any food product advertised or labeled as "local" unless such food product originated in New York or meets other guidelines established for retail food products.
Title
Provides that no person, corporation, partnership or limited liability company shall knowingly sell any food product advertised or labeled as "local" unless such food product originated in New York or meets other guidelines established for retail food products.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.214 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.324 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a1460 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.429 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A01460 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.214