NY S03821 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - SIGNED CHAP.68
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - SIGNED CHAP.68
Summary
Prohibits the agents of an operator from selling tickets to secondary ticket resellers; extends from June 1, 2009 until May 15, 2010, the expiration of article 25 of the arts and cultural affairs law relating to the regulation of the sales of tickets to places of entertainment; directs the attorney general to review and report upon the effectiveness of such article on or before February 1, 2010.
Title
Prohibits the agents of an operator from selling tickets to secondary ticket resellers; extends from June 1, 2009 until May 15, 2010, the expiration of article 25 of the arts and cultural affairs law relating to the regulation of the sales of tickets to places of entertainment; directs the attorney general to review and report upon the effectiveness of such article on or before February 1, 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-09 | SIGNED CHAP.68 | |
2009-06-04 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-06-01 | returned to senate | |
2009-06-01 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-01 | ordered to third reading rules cal.34 | |
2009-06-01 | substituted for a7950d | |
2009-06-01 | referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-01 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-06-01 | REPASSED SENATE | |
2009-05-26 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3821B | |
2009-05-19 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3821A | |
2009-05-19 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-19 | returned to senate | |
2009-05-19 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | |
2009-05-18 | referred to tourism, arts and sports development | |
2009-05-18 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-05-18 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-05-11 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-06 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-05 | 1ST REPORT CAL.265 | |
2009-04-02 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07950 (Same As) 2009-06-09 - SIGNED CHAP.68
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03821&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |