NY S03793 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3319
Status: Introduced on April 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3319
Summary
Provides that airbags (not required by federal law) sold and installed by motor vehicle dealers or manufacturers must be offered as standard with the model or as stand alone options; provides for civil penalties for violations; further provides certain exemptions; authorizes attorney general enforcement.
Title
Provides that airbags (not required by federal law) sold and installed by motor vehicle dealers or manufacturers must be offered as standard with the model or as stand alone options; provides for civil penalties for violations; further provides certain exemptions; authorizes attorney general enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | SUBSTITUTED BY A3319 | |
2009-06-01 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-27 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-26 | 1ST REPORT CAL.454 | |
2009-05-05 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2009-04-01 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A3319 (Same As) 2010-01-20 - committed to consumer affairs and protection
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03793&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |