NY S03791 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the modification of the New York State Stormwater Management Design Manual by the department of environmental conservation; requires signage; defines reasonable slope to limit the immediate drop off to the deeper end; requires aquatic vegetation to be established in the aquatic and safety benches; examines the status of safety features by the maintenance authority; includes any other provisions essential to further promote safety in and around stormwater retention ponds.
Title
Requires the modification of the New York State Stormwater Management Design Manual by the department of environmental conservation; requires signage; defines reasonable slope to limit the immediate drop off to the deeper end; requires aquatic vegetation to be established in the aquatic and safety benches; examines the status of safety features by the maintenance authority; includes any other provisions essential to further promote safety in and around stormwater retention ponds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.557 |
2011-09-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.221 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a6544 |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2011-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.243 |
2011-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06544 (Same As) 2011-06-15 - substituted by s3791