NY S03760 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2820
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2820
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the provisions relating to the New York state thoroughbred breeding and development fund until seven years after the commencement of the operation of a video lottery terminal facility at Aqueduct racetrack.
Title
Relates to extending the provisions relating to the New York state thoroughbred breeding and development fund until seven years after the commencement of the operation of a video lottery terminal facility at Aqueduct racetrack.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2820 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.199 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A02820 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - signed chap.42