NY S03746 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.53
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.53
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the affordable residential green building program which would provide incentives to owners for the construction of new residential buildings which are affordable.
Title
Establishes the affordable residential green building program which would provide incentives to owners for the construction of new residential buildings which are affordable.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.53 |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.486 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.477 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a4969a |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1264 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3746A |
2017-04-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04969 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s3746a