NY S03743 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the one-call notification system.
Title
Relates to the one-call notification system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.935 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.548 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03771 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - enacting clause stricken