NY S03726 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-02 - PRINT NUMBER 3726A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to use of accrued sick time, compensation time or vacation time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to use of accrued sick time, compensation time or vacation time.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-02SenatePRINT NUMBER 3726A
2018-11-02SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2017-01-26SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A00993 (Same As) 2018-05-17 - advanced to third reading cal.901

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback