NY S03724 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the New York state council on the arts to award certificates of merit to artists in selected disciplines.
Title
Authorizes the New York state council on the arts to award certificates of merit to artists in selected disciplines.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1339 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3724A |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.622 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00272 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means