NY S03721 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-15 - SIGNED CHAP.393
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-15 - SIGNED CHAP.393
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends chapter 489 of the laws of 2004, relating to the mortgage recording tax in the county of Fulton, to extend the effectiveness of such chapter.
Title
Amends chapter 489 of the laws of 2004, relating to the mortgage recording tax in the county of Fulton, to extend the effectiveness of such chapter.
Sponsors
Sen. Hugh Farley [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.393 |
2011-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | home rule request |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.369 |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a5813 |
2011-05-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.470 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05813 (Same As) 2011-06-16 - substituted by s3721