NY S03716 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the truth in heating penalties and amends the enhanced property disclosure statement.
Title
Increases the truth in heating penalties and amends the enhanced property disclosure statement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-05-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-13 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-12 | 1ST REPORT CAL.305 | |
2009-04-21 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2009-03-30 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |