NY S03691 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - SIGNED CHAP.399
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - SIGNED CHAP.399
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of New York to discontinue use of certain park land and convey it to St. Michael's Prostestant Episcopal Church.
Title
Authorizes the city of New York to discontinue use of certain park land and convey it to St. Michael's Prostestant Episcopal Church.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.399 |
2015-10-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.609 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a5246a |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1455 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3691A |
2015-05-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2015-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A05246 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s3691a