NY S03667 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enables victims and relatives of victims to view parole hearings via closed circuit television or a secure online website.
Title
Enables victims and relatives of victims to view parole hearings via closed circuit television or a secure online website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2016-04-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-04-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.439 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2015-03-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-03-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.200 |
2015-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A04065 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to correction