NY S03657 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the resultsNY.gov website; requires that such website shall provide to the user of the website comparative data and statistics to identify the state's performance regionally and nationally relating to, but not limited to, the economy, education, public safety, energy, housing and the environment.
Title
Creates the resultsNY.gov website; requires that such website shall provide to the user of the website comparative data and statistics to identify the state's performance regionally and nationally relating to, but not limited to, the economy, education, public safety, energy, housing and the environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2012-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-02-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-02-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.206 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2011-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.274 |
2011-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |