NY S03638 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.474
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.474
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to oversight of developmental disability care organizations and coordinate services.
Title
Relates to oversight of developmental disability care organizations and coordinate services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.474 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.337 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a7200 |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2015-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.821 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3638A |
2015-04-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2015-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07200 (Same As) 2015-06-15 - substituted by s3638a