NY S03607 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to licensing laser hair removal technicians; establishes laser hair removal rules, regulations and standards.
Title
Relates to licensing laser hair removal technicians; establishes laser hair removal rules, regulations and standards.
Sponsors
Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2024-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.579 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2023-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.660 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02623 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to economic development