NY S03594 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.587
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.587
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sets the number of petitioners necessary to call for a vote on increasing the amount of funding of the annual contribution for the operating budget of a registered public or free association library at twenty-five qualified voters of a municipality.
Title
Sets the number of petitioners necessary to call for a vote on increasing the amount of funding of the annual contribution for the operating budget of a registered public or free association library at twenty-five qualified voters of a municipality.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Jacob Ashby [R] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Libraries Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Libraries Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.587 |
2023-10-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.628 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a5266 |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
2023-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1209 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LIBRARIES |
Same As/Similar To
A05266 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - substituted by s3594