NY S03587 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3801A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3801A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enacting the "toll payer protection act" which includes a tolls by mail system for the payment of tolls by electronic toll devices; provides for the repeal of such system five years after the enactment of such system.
Title
Relates to enacting the "toll payer protection act" which includes a tolls by mail system for the payment of tolls by electronic toll devices; provides for the repeal of such system five years after the enactment of such system.
Sponsors
Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. John Mannion [D] |
Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3801A |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1053 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3587C |
2022-03-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1486 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3587B |
2021-05-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-04-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3587A |
2021-04-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03801 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - tabled