NY A03801 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enacting the "toll payer protection act" which includes a tolls by mail system for the payment of tolls by electronic toll devices; provides for the repeal of such system five years after the enactment of such system.
Title
Relates to enacting the "toll payer protection act" which includes a tolls by mail system for the payment of tolls by electronic toll devices; provides for the repeal of such system five years after the enactment of such system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-16 | Assembly | vetoed memo.109 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1053 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3587C |
2022-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.521 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.521 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | print number 3801a |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03587 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3801A