NY S03569 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires medical professionals to report patients diagnosed with conditions which cause unconsciousness or unawareness to the department of motor vehicles for the purpose of determining driving privileges; requires licensed drivers having any such condition to report the condition to the commissioner of motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires medical professionals to report patients diagnosed with conditions which cause unconsciousness or unawareness to the department of motor vehicles for the purpose of determining driving privileges; requires licensed drivers having any such condition to report the condition to the commissioner of motor vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1212
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2017-01-24SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A10094 (Same As) 2018-03-14 - referred to transportation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback