NY S03552 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the licensing of genetic counselors; creates the state board for genetic counseling.
Title
Provides for the licensing of genetic counselors; creates the state board for genetic counseling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2023-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.680 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00049 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to higher education