NY S03547 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.400
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.400
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Dustin Waldron, a police officer of the village of East Aurora, in the county of Erie, to receive certain service credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Title
Authorizes Dustin Waldron, a police officer of the village of East Aurora, in the county of Erie, to receive certain service credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.400 |
2019-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.646 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6738 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.918 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06738 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.400