NY S03547 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 3547B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 3547B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the state sales tax on wireless telephone services and provides for a local option of imposing such taxes.
Title
Removes the state sales tax on wireless telephone services and provides for a local option of imposing such taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3547B |
2012-01-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-03-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3547A |
2011-03-18 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10430 (Same As) 2012-05-29 - referred to ways and means