NY S03543 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.702
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.702
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain professionals to provide and the state education department to collect information about the practice of their professions.
Title
Requires certain professionals to provide and the state education department to collect information about the practice of their professions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.702 |
2021-12-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.126 |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | substituted for a3050 |
2021-03-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.492 |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03050 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - substituted by s3543