NY A03050 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - substituted by s3543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - substituted by s3543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain professionals to provide and the state education department to collect information about the practice of their professions.
Title
Requires certain professionals to provide and the state education department to collect information about the practice of their professions.
Sponsors
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Doug Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Assembly | substituted by s3543 |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.126 |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S03543 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.702