NY S03542 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - SIGNED CHAP.398
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - SIGNED CHAP.398
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the public availability of certain competitive requests for proposals.
Title
Relates to the public availability of certain competitive requests for proposals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.398 |
2015-10-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.382 |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | substituted for a6893a |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-04-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3542A |
2015-03-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.189 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06893 (Same As) 2015-05-19 - substituted by s3542a