NY S03536 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5664
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5664
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the lease of lands located at SUNY college at Farmingdale for the development and operation of a biotechnology and other technology-oriented office, research and manufacturing facility.
Title
Relates to the lease of lands located at SUNY college at Farmingdale for the development and operation of a biotechnology and other technology-oriented office, research and manufacturing facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5664 |
2011-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.201 |
2011-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05664 (Same As) 2011-04-13 - signed chap.13