NY S03518 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - PRINT NUMBER 3518A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - PRINT NUMBER 3518A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain controlled substances offenses relating to synthetic cannabis.
Title
Relates to certain controlled substances offenses relating to synthetic cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3518A |
2018-06-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-04-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.388 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |