NY S03516 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5984
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5984
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any member of a district or county dental society who has been a member since 1977 may maintain his or her membership in that district or county dental society regardless of where such member resides or practices dentistry.
Title
Provides that any member of a district or county dental society who has been a member since 1977 may maintain his or her membership in that district or county dental society regardless of where such member resides or practices dentistry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5984 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1003 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05984 (Same As) 2017-09-12 - signed chap.288