NY S03512 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - PRINT NUMBER 3512B
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - PRINT NUMBER 3512B
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing voice communication services to incarcerated individuals in state correctional facilities at no cost; requires agencies charged with the operation and management of state and local correctional facilities and juvenile detention facilities to provide persons in their custody with voice communication service at a minimum of 90 minutes per day.
Title
Relates to providing voice communication services to incarcerated individuals in state correctional facilities at no cost; requires agencies charged with the operation and management of state and local correctional facilities and juvenile detention facilities to provide persons in their custody with voice communication service at a minimum of 90 minutes per day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3512B |
2022-03-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2021-10-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3512A |
2021-10-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2021-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03096 (Same As) 2022-03-08 - reported referred to ways and means