NY S03505 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.274
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.274
Summary
Extends until November 30, 2011, the authority of the county of Essex to impose an additional 3/4% sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends until November 30, 2011, the authority of the county of Essex to impose an additional 3/4% sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-28 | SIGNED CHAP.274 | |
2009-07-17 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-06-10 | returned to senate | |
2009-06-10 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-10 | home rule request | |
2009-06-10 | ordered to third reading rules cal.147 | |
2009-06-10 | substituted for a7084 | |
2009-05-20 | referred to ways and means | |
2009-05-20 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-05-20 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-05-20 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2009-04-27 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-04-22 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-04-21 | 1ST REPORT CAL.201 | |
2009-03-20 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07084 (Same As) 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.274
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03505&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |