NY A07084 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.274
Status: Introduced on March 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.274
Summary
Extends until November 30, 2011, the authority of the county of Essex to impose an additional 3/4% sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends until November 30, 2011, the authority of the county of Essex to impose an additional 3/4% sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-10 | substituted by s3505 | |
2009-06-10 | rules report cal.147 | |
2009-06-10 | reported | |
2009-06-08 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-03-20 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03505 (Same As) 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.274
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07084&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |