NY S03492 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-07 - signed chap.82
Status: Introduced on March 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-07 - signed chap.82
Summary
Authorizes farm wineries to store and sell the equipment and supplies used for wine-making.
Title
Authorizes farm wineries to store and sell the equipment and supplies used for wine-making.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | SUBSTITUTED BY A2321 | |
2009-05-26 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-20 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-19 | 1ST REPORT CAL.420 | |
2009-03-20 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A02321 (Same As) 2009-07-07 - signed chap.82
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03492&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |